Accounts and annual returns ISLE OF WIGHT GATEWAY CLUB

Charity Number: 1082837
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2009 27 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2008 10 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 23 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2007 02 May 2008 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2007 08 February 2008 On Time