HOLY NATION CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
general church activities; mission work overseas; sharing gospel message; publishing Jesus and making Him known
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Burundi
- Cyprus
- Ghana
- India
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Malta
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Poland
- Romania
- Rwanda
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 14 November 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ani Nnanyelugo | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MISHA SAMUEL | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM BURGESS | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER GROOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAQUIM FERNANDES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.61k | £174.03k | £310.80k | £418.89k | £312.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.75k | £170.43k | £251.68k | £299.72k | £202.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 14 December 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 14 December 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 15 December 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 15 December 2020 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE CHURCH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FUNDAMENTAL TRUTHS OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND AS APPROVED BY THE GENERAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME (THE STATEMENT) 2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH OR ANY OF THEM 3) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH CONSISTENTLY WITH THE STATEMENT 4) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE WORK OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND THE PROMOTION OF THE SPIRITUAL TEACHING AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE STATEMENT AND THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS OBSERVANCES THAT MANIFEST THE STATEMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Nation Church
PO Box 4215
LONDON
SW1E 5XH
- Phone:
- 02076301641
- Email:
- info@holynationchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window