Trustees MARSTON MONTGOMERY CORONATION HALL
Charity number: 1085703

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Broad | Chair | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Thomson | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dino Goold | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Williams | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Bosley | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bates | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marston Montgomery Parish Council | Trustee | 11 December 1997 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.