Trustees EVERYMAN THEATRE CARDIFF LIMITED

Charity Number: 1082484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Toby Harris Chair 20 September 2023
None on record
Kelsey Penfold Trustee 03 March 2025
None on record
Cressida Abigail McDougall Ford Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Amy Brooks Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Sarah Day Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Barry Francis SLACK Trustee 21 September 2022
None on record
Katherine Stanbury Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
SUSAN OSMOLSKA Trustee
None on record