EIRIANFA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Eirianfa Association manages and maintains the Eirianfa Community Centre for the benefit of groups and organisations in the locality by hiring out the rooms for meetings, educational activities, training sessions, exercise classes etc and also utilizing some rooms as office space for organisations with similar aims to the Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,385 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 21 May 2001: Standard registration
- EIRIANFA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN RICHARD WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
||||||
Cllr Pauline Edwards | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Graham | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Patricia Morris | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Councillor ROY TICKLE Cllr | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Mike Cottle | Trustee | 22 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR TIM WEBB | Trustee | 13 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 30 January 2000 |
|
|||||
MARY DENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.85k | £52.50k | £55.38k | £50.47k | £50.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.37k | £39.16k | £38.41k | £53.55k | £53.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.00k | £3.30k | £7.39k | £7.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 31 JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DENBIGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED " THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF EIRIANFA, AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY OR VOLUNTARY BODY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
DENBIGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eirianfa
Factory Place
DENBIGH
LL16 3TS
- Phone:
- 01745816522
- Email:
- office@eirianfa.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window