THE PARR BAND (RICHARDSON LTD) ST HELENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Undertakes engagements (concerts, fetes, church processions of witness, civic and civilian marches, Christmas festival activities) to raise monies for the Band expenses and assist other charities with their fundraising. Teaches both adult and young people to play brass instruments as members of the Training Band and encourages entry into the Associated Board music examinations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- St Helens
Governance
- 02 July 2002: Standard registration
- THE PARR BAND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PARKINSON | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN PARKINSON | Trustee | 05 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PYE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET KIMBERLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.42k | £1.64k | £2.65k | £4.07k | £3.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.93k | £2.39k | £4.43k | £4.34k | £3.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN BRASS BAND MUSIC AND PLAYING OF BRASS BAND INSTRUMENTS BY MEANS OF PARTICIPATION IN CONCERTS, CONTESTS AND OTHER FORMS OF MUSICAL PRESENTATION BOTH FOR FULL AND PARTIAL ENSEMBLE OF THE BAND. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE PERSONS WISHING TO LEARN TO PLAY A BRASS INSTRUMENT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP THE MUSICAL SKILLS OF INDIVIDUALS AS SOLOISTS AND AS INTEGRATED PLAYERS OF THE BAND C) TO SUPPORT IN THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE COMMITTEE OTHER CHARITABLE EVENTS/ORGANISATIONS
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Seddon Close
Eccleston
ST. HELENS
WA10 5AG
- Phone:
- 01744731002
- Email:
- SIGFLO19@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window