BREAKTHROUGH - SHEFFIELD MULTI-ETHNIC DRUG SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Breakthrough is a drugs outreach service delivering advice, information and support to BME communities. We offer consultancy and training on cultural awareness and cultural competency to professionals. We work with offenders in prison and the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Doncaster
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 06 September 2002: Standard registration
- 25 January 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SHEFFIELD BLACK DRUGS SERVICE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.39k | £216.74k | £245.61k | £210.70k | £218.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.90k | £208.96k | £249.69k | £233.64k | £231.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 19 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 19 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 18 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 04 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 23 February 2009 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 02 June 2009 | 122 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 27 February 2008 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 27 February 2008 | 27 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 10 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 10 November 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 21 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9 AUGUST 2002.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE, BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, INFORMATION, ADVICE; (1) SUFFERERS OR POTENTIAL SUFFERERS FROM DEPENDENCY UPON, ADDICTION TO OR MISUSE OF DRUGS (WITH A VIEW TO PREVENTION AND EDUCATION) AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THOSE SUFFERERS OR POTENTIAL SUFFERERS FROM THE AFRICAN, AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN, SOMALI, YEMENI, PAKISTANI AND BANGLADESHI COMMUNITIES IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ENVIRONS ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT') AND; (2) THE FAMILIES, PARTNERS AND FRIENDS OF SUCH SUFFERERS OR POTENTIAL SUFFERERS FROM THE EFFECTS OF DEPENDENCY UPON, ADDICTION TO OR MISUSE OF DRUGS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window