COMMUNITY FOSTER CARE

Charity Number: 1084124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing foster care for children who cannot live with their birth families. This entails supporting, supervising, managing and training foster carers to care for children effectively and providing a strong support team who can ensure that children's life chances and choices are enhanced.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 2000: Standard registration
  • 15 February 2020: Funds received from 1150166 COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Ann Dwight Chair 30 July 2015
None on record
Jane Comerford Trustee 31 March 2022
None on record
Mary Cox Trustee 04 March 2021
None on record
stephanie Malone Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
Charles Wade Trustee 27 November 2014
None on record
Mariana Straton Trustee 28 September 2011
None on record
JOANNA MARGARET JANSEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.47m £2.46m £2.36m £2.34m £2.37m
Total expenditure £2.32m £2.27m £2.34m £2.39m £2.43m
Income from government contracts £2.40m £2.45m £2.34m £2.33m £2.37m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £70 £116 £36 £1.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.47m £2.45m £2.34m £2.33m £2.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.30k £12 £205 £393 £1.10k
Income - Other £4.00k £7.94k £17.90k £13.99k £43.57k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.32m £2.27m £2.34m £2.39m £2.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £6.39k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £35.33k £20.88k £14.29k £18.86k £12.34k
Long-term investments £0 £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k £0
Other assets £624.75k £839.85k £851.13k £793.83k £708.01k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £138.18k £156.48k £145.25k £139.35k £160.29k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 February 2023 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 February 2023 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 July 2022 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 July 2022 165 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit A 76 Kingsholm Road
GLOUCESTER
GL1 3BD
Phone:
01452849301