CIWM (RPM)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research,development,education, the collection & dissemination of information about waste management generally to encourage the use of more sustainable waste management practices.The advancement of the scientific, technical & practical aspects of waste management for the safeguarding of the environment.The achievement &maintenance of good standards of waste management practice,competence &conduct.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 January 2001: Standard registration
- 21 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 21 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1090968 CHARTERED INSTITUTION OF WASTES MANAGEMENT
- CIWM (EB) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.10k | £7.95k | £6.93k | £2.01k | £2.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.38k | £23.11k | £21.58k | £9.37k | £11.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 04 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 25 June 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 19 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 28 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY A WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 13 DECEMBER 2000 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- 1. EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE BENEFIT TO THE ENVIRONMENT OF SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES; AND 2. CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INTO SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window