CROHNS & COLITIS SUPPORT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 August 2001: Standard registration
- 24 August 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1140930 ST. MARK'S HOSPITAL FOUNDATION
- HCCCST (Working name)
- HERTS CHILDREN'S CROHNS AND COLITIS SUPPORT TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £545 | £20 | £885 | £313 | £145 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/08/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND FOR THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, PARTICULARLY IN WATFORD AND ELSEWHERE IN HERTFORDSHIRE, BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND OTHER SUPPORT TO SUFFERERS OF INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE, TO THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS AND TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND BY ASSISTING WATFORD GENERAL HOSPITAL IN THEIR MANAGEMENT OF AND RESEARCH INTO INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE AND RELATED CONDITIONS PROVIDED THAT IN SO DOING THE CHARITY SHALL NOT RELIEVE ANY LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY, NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE TRUST OR ANY OTHER BODY OF ANY OF ITS STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window