THE CRYSTAL ROGERS ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal welfare in India
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 27 October 2000: Standard registration
- CUPA (Working name)
- COMPASSION UNLIMITED PLUS ACTION (UK) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEMARY FRANCES POOLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sameera Singh | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rochelle Louise Lucas | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ELIZABETH KNOCKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.76k | £5.16k | £502.94k | £205.31k | £9.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.44k | £6.02k | £14.05k | £176.07k | £25.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £502.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £186 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £500.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £14.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £14.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES 25 JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, NEGLECT OR MALTREATMENT; B) TO EDUCATE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS CONCERNING ANIMAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
INDIA AND/OR SUCH OTHER COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Henshaw Street
LONDON
SE17 1PE
- Phone:
- 07910426206
- Email:
- rochelle.l.lucas@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window