ALL AGE DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we run a domacillary care service in cheshire in a number of communities providing personal plus heath care to poeple in need of heath care. we also provide a mental heath advocacy progamme and sevice in wirral liverpool and cheshire Are other activity is providing hollidays for the sick disadvantage through ill heath we are developeing an advice service hopefully to be running in 2015
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- Shropshire
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 28 December 2000: Standard registration
- 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 May 2014: Re-registered
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
All Age Developement Trust | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN COLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER COLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA VERONICA ASHBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2017 | 01/12/2018 | 01/12/2019 | 01/12/2020 | 01/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.27k | £2.44k | £2.88k | £3.26k | £2.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.24k | £2.42k | £2.81k | £3.20k | £2.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 235 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 235 days | |
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 601 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 601 days | |
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT IN MERSEYSIDE AND CHESHIRE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, DISABILITY, ILL HEALTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Gateway Conference Centre
MPAC
75 London Road
Liverpool
MERSEYSIDE
L3 8NY
- Phone:
- 07734926141
- Email:
- rodashbyjobworld@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window