Financial history BURY SOCIETY FOR BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED

Charity number: 1102525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £196.12k £182.69k £180.13k £197.77k £256.08k
Total expenditure £204.04k £165.70k £168.01k £186.14k £201.75k
Income from government contracts £77.00k £75.95k £75.95k £75.95k £75.95k
Income from government grants N/A £11.00k £4.00k N/A N/A