Financial history WOOD NORTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1082585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.08k £22.50k £21.50k £17.89k £14.51k
Total expenditure £12.95k £7.51k £16.30k £22.05k £12.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.71k £11.68k N/A N/A