Trustees WOOD NORTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1082585

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Julia Morley | Chair | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ross | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Frances Avery | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Louise Peace | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Crowe | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE LIDSTONE-SCOTT | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.