NEIGHBOURCARE ST JOHN'S WOOD AND MAIDA VALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main activity is one to one befriending of isolated older people. We also do outings in our minibus which is our main expense. We hold several birthday parties a year and participate in a Christmas day lunch, all for isolated people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 17 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Bradley | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE SHEILA DAVIS | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH SALINSON | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
GERARDO URDANETA | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA SARAH NASH | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN FUREY | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Denise Ratigan | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Giovanna Popeck | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HELEN TRAVIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
XAVIER LECACHEUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ALLEN HOGARTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.42k | £10.83k | £31.77k | £7.57k | £128.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.95k | £7.33k | £13.46k | £12.28k | £7.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH MARCH 2000, AS AMENDED 25TH JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE ST. JOHN'S WOOD AND MAIDA VALE AREA AND ITS SURROUNDS AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF LONELINESS, POVERTY, DISTRESS AND ISOLATION, AND THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT..
Area of benefit
ST. JOHN'S WOOD AND MAIDA VALE AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEIGHBOURCARE
25 ST EDMUND'S TERRACE
LONDON
NW8 7PY
- Phone:
- 07941 425116
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window