THE SOCIETY FOR CONSERVATION IN AVICULTURE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation, education & conservation of avian species including rescue & rehoming facilities through our current membership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 September 2000: Standard registration
- 23 July 2019: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.16k | £3.20k | £2.94k | £2.25k | £1.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.49k | £3.08k | £3.10k | £2.78k | £2.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 26 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 15 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 08 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JUNE 2000, AS AMENDED 1 SEPT 2007 AND 26 SEPT 2009.
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE STUDY AND CONSERVATION OF ALL AVIAN SPECIES INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF BREEDING PROGRAMMES WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON PRESERVING HIGHLY ENDANGERED SPECIES; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF AVICULTURE AND THE RESPONSIBLE STEWARDSHIP AND CARE OF CAPTIVE EXOTIC BIRDS; AND (111) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROVIDE SHELTER FOR UNWANTED, ABUSED OR ABANDONED BIRDS WITH THE PURPOSE OF PROVIDING CARE, REHABILITATION, REHOMING OR A PERMANENT SANCTUARY FOR THOSE UNSUITABLE FOR REHOMING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window