SPON END BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration of a range of medieval and later buildings at 119-123 Upper Spon Street, Coventry and operation of those buildings for the benefit of local people, including the creation of an educational resource and heritage visitor attraction; "the Weaver's House".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Coventry City
Governance
- 02 October 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TINA WOODROFFE | Chair | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peterson Cobbett | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
SARA MAYCOCK | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW WATERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Nathaniel Warren Alcock OBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr Jennifer Louise Waters | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.50k | £44.67k | £82.75k | £51.11k | £52.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.55k | £61.53k | £47.59k | £53.54k | £52.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £30.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE CITY OF COVENTRY AFORESAID IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 36(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1990) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spon End Building Preservation
Trust
121 Upper Spon Street
COVENTRY
CV1 3BQ
- Phone:
- 02476257117
- Email:
- info@theweavershouse.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window