Financial history FAREHAM WEST TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity Number: 1082510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £7.15k £3.05k £1.81k £5.68k £3.92k
Total expenditure £6.97k £2.38k £2.06k £5.59k £3.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A