FRIENDS OF DOUBLE JOY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To fundraise and receive donations for Double Joy Children's Farm To send regular grants to Double Joy Children's Farm To provide financial support for young people to train in vocational skills on leaving Double Joy To raise awareness in the UK of the work carried out at Double Joy Children's farm
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
- Hertfordshire
- Lancashire
- Sheffield City
- Kenya
Governance
- 26 June 2001: Standard registration
- FODJ (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Alston | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|||||
FRANCIS OPIYO RACHIER | Trustee | 11 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANA GIBBON | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISSIE HINDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN HILLIARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN FRANCIS NOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr STEPHEN FRANCIS DEALLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.18k | £111.78k | £132.37k | £127.16k | £139.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.27k | £121.56k | £126.67k | £121.45k | £127.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 5 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROTECTION OF CHILDREN IN NYANZA PROVINCE, SOUTH WESTERN KENYA (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) PARTICULARLY THOSE CHILDREN AT DOUBLE JOY CHILDREN’S FARM.
Area of benefit
NYANZA PROVINCE SOUTH WESTERN KENYA
Contact information
- Address:
-
185 GRAHAM ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 3GR
- Phone:
- 01142301627
- Email:
- doublejoy1994@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window