Governing document VINE CITY INTERNATIONAL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND MAY 2000, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25TH JANUARY 2001 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 5 MARCH 2009 as amended on 29 Nov 2018 as amended on 31 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL OF PRAYER, THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND TEACHING OF SPIRITUAL PRINCIPLES OF PRAYER AND CHRISTIAN LIVING AND THE HOLDING OF RELIGIOUS CEREMONIES AND SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.