MAKING A DIFFERENCE INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting a church in the Philippine Island of Camotes which is the base for helping people in the local community. The church building has been adapted to accommodate classrooms so that during weekdays it serves as a Christian school providing excellent education for children from the age of 4-9 years old. There is a mix of fee-paying and sponsored children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Philippines
Governance
- 22 March 2001: Standard registration
- MAD INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN WYE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jane Smith | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Wye | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Debby Ward | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.27k | £23.08k | £36.11k | £49.59k | £36.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.03k | £25.40k | £35.69k | £49.77k | £40.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PRIMARILY BY THE FOUNDATION OF AND MAINTENANCE OF SCHOOLS AND ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE SO THAT CONDITIONS OF LIFE MIGHT BE IMPROVED THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACICE, WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Copse Close
Watchet
TA23 0HW
- Phone:
- 01984 634869
- Email:
- awmad@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window