THE PORTLAND SCULPTURE AND QUARRY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regeneration of a former industrial landscape that gives in-depth access to culture, nature, education and art through the sharing and exchange of knowledge and skills between people from different backgrounds. Using principles of environmental sustainability in all operations and innovative educational practice that is inclusive and accessible to all in an area of deprivation and high needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 May 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ANTONY EMMET | Chair |
|
||||||
Elaine Diana Graham | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Toby Simon Russell | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Celia Downham | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Patricia Beech | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.39k | £76.55k | £79.28k | £60.75k | £52.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.78k | £43.17k | £47.73k | £73.82k | £75.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.14k | £12.00k | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 11TH NOVEMBER 1999 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6TH APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF STUDY, RESEARCH, PRACTICE AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE ARTS AND SCULPTURE THEREBY STIMULATING PUBLIC INTEREST IN THESE AND OTHER RELATED ARTISTIC AND CULTURAL FIELDS, AND OF THE ENVIRONMENT, GEOLOGY, GEOMORPHOLOGY, ARCHAEOLOGY, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF THE ISLE OF PORTLAND, DORSET AND OTHER REGIONS IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
ISLE OF PORTLAND, DORSET, UK AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PORTLAND SCULPTURE AND QUARRY
DRILL HALL HOUSE
EASTON LANE
PORTLAND
DORSET
DT5 1BW
- Phone:
- 01305826736
- Email:
- psqt@learningstone.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window