Property Research Trust Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Undertake such exclusively charitable objects or purposes in the United Kingdom or any other part of the world as Trustees in their absolute discretion think fit including but not limited to the advancement of education in any subjects which concern the built and natural environments or the theory of and practice of surveying in any of its aspects, in such ways as the Trustees think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Germany
- India
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
Governance
- 15 March 2001: Standard registration
- 22 October 2014: Funds received from 313744 THE R I C S EDUCATION TRUST
- RICS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- RICS RESEARCH TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robert Louis Harris | Chair | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Blake | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Edward Bellman | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Dennis Child | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Papadakos | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Whitney Bevan | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chyi Lin Lee | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Organ | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Sara Wilkinson | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.71k | £178 | £178 | £31 | £676 | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.50k | £13.66k | £13.66k | £7.45k | £8.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2024 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/09/2012 as amended on 19 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO UNDERTAKE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ANY SUBJECTS WHICH CONCERN THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS OR THE THEORY OF AND PRACTICE OF SURVEYING IN ANY OF ITS ASPECTS, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY: 1. PROVIDING GRANTS, SCHOLARSHIPS, AWARDS, PRIZES OR OTHERWISE TO THOSE UNDERTAKING STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO MATTERS RELATING TO THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF SURVEYING AND THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS; AND 2. RAISING AWARENESS, PROMOTING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, WITH A VIEW TO PRESERVING, CONSERVING AND IMPROVING THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
167-169 Great Portland street
5th Floor
London
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 01737 242776
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window