Governing document Property Research Trust Limited

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/09/2012 as amended on 19 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO UNDERTAKE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ANY SUBJECTS WHICH CONCERN THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS OR THE THEORY OF AND PRACTICE OF SURVEYING IN ANY OF ITS ASPECTS, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY: 1. PROVIDING GRANTS, SCHOLARSHIPS, AWARDS, PRIZES OR OTHERWISE TO THOSE UNDERTAKING STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO MATTERS RELATING TO THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF SURVEYING AND THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS; AND 2. RAISING AWARENESS, PROMOTING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, WITH A VIEW TO PRESERVING, CONSERVING AND IMPROVING THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.