Trustees Property Research Trust Limited
Charity Number: 1085587

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robert Louis Harris | Chair | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Blake | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Edward Bellman | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Dennis Child | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Papadakos | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Whitney Bevan | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chyi Lin Lee | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Organ | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Sara Wilkinson | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.