Financial history SYRACUSE UNIVERSITY (USA) LONDON PROGRAM

Charity number: 1088366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.17m £2.76m £5.38m £7.03m £7.54m
Total expenditure £5.87m £2.89m £5.46m £6.73m £7.76m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £75.51k £488.46k £27.86k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.14m £2.22m £5.33m £6.95m £7.49m
Income - Other trading activities £35.83k £20.04k £52.16k £76.29k £50.36k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £60 £12 £12 £315 £895
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.87m £2.89m £5.46m £6.73m £7.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £73.54k £52.25k £50.18k £106.11k £106.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0