YOUNG ENGINEERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
******IN LIQUIDATION****** YOUNG ENGINEERS IS A CHARITABLE ORGANISATION THAT AIMS TO STIMULATE INTEREST, APPRECIATION AND ENGAGEMENT IN THE PRACTICAL APPLICATION OF ENGINEERING BY YOUNG PEOPLE IN PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EDUCATION. IT ENABLES VOLUNTEER TEACHERS, CLUB LEADERS AND THEIR SUPPORTERS TO PROVIDE EXCITING, CHALLENGING AND CREATIVE ACTIVITIES THAT ENRICH THE STEM CURRICULUM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 December 2000: Standard registration
- 15 March 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- YOUNG ENGINEERS CLUBS (Working name)
- YOUNG ENGINEERS FOR BRITAIN (Working name)
- YOUNG ENGINEERS K'NEX CHALLENGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.61k | £265.40k | £342.75k | £395.07k | £290.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.14k | £314.89k | £348.04k | £337.53k | £328.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 15 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN ALL ASPECTS OF ENGINEERING INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF ELECTRONICS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: THE ESTABLISHMENT, SUPPORT AND MAINTENANCE OF ENGINEERING CLUBS IN SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES OF FURTHER EDUCATION; AFFORDING RECOGNITION OF ENGINEERING INCLUDING THE SAID SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF ELECTRONICS, THROUGH (1) THE MAKING OF AWARDS AND GIVING PRIZES TO PERSONS IN FULL-TIME EDUCATION WHO DESIGN AND BUILD ITEMS WITH USEFUL PRACTICAL APPLICATION AND (2) PROMOTING A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THE PRACTICAL REQUIREMENTS OF COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY AMONGST STUDENTS .
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window