Financial history AKAMBA AID FUND

Charity number: 1083554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £74.79k £31.62k £39.97k £82.29k £99.88k
Total expenditure £69.57k £24.00k £21.97k £86.46k £95.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A