Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL TIGER MOTH CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity Number: 1087253
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 25 June 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 08 July 2008 | 159 days late | |
Annual return | 30 March 2006 | 22 March 2008 | 417 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2006 | 27 June 2007 | 148 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 27 March 2006 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 27 March 2006 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window