INTERNATIONAL TIGER MOTH CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 June 2001: Standard registration
- 16 July 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TIGERS FOR KIDS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 30/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.00k | £6.00k | £6.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.00k | £6.20k | £8.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 25 June 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 08 July 2008 | 159 days late | |
Annual return | 30 March 2006 | 22 March 2008 | 417 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2006 | 27 June 2007 | 148 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 27 March 2006 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 27 March 2006 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25TH AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT SUCH INSTITUTIONS AND PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window