Financial history Holy Trinity Church Salcombe Conservation Trust

Charity number: 1085481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £17.66k £5.02k £3.19k £2.06k £13.06k
Total expenditure £3.28k £3.02k £1.12k £3.33k £3.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A