KCL LIBRARY & ARCHIVE SERVICES (LIMITED)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support thr charitable objectives of King's College London and to assist King's College London in carrying out its charitable objects by such means as shall be thought fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 07 June 2001: Standard registration
- 21 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KING'S COLLEGE LONDON (ROLLS ESTATE LIBRARY PROJECT) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.85m | £7.86m | £7.84m | £7.84m | £6.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.07m | £7.17m | £7.23m | £7.61m | £3.14m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.82m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.73k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.61m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.15k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 27 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 29 May 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF 1ST AUGUST 2000 AND BY RESOLUTION OF 23RD MAY 2001.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE LIBRARY IS ESTABLISHED ARE (1) TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF KING'S COLLEGE LONDON ("KCL") AND TO ASSIST KCL IN CARRYING OUT ITS CHARITABLE OBJECTS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- (A) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION ART SCIENCE AND RELIGION BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT; (B) THE PROVISION OF LIBRARY, ARCHIVE AND RELATED FACILITIES FOR USE BY STUDENTS STAFF AND OFFICERS OF KCL OTHER COLLEGES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF LONDON AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC; AND (C) THE ACQUISITION AND/OR HOLDING OF REAL OR PERSONAL PROPERTY FOR THE USE AND/OR BENEFIT OF KCL. (2) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY (A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE BENEFITS TO THE ENVIRONMENT OF SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES; AND (B) CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INTO SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH. IN THIS CLAUSE SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES INCLUDES WASTE MINIMISATION, MINIMISATION OF POLLUTION AND HARM FROM WASTE, REUSE OF WASTE, RECYCLING OF WASTE, WASTE RECOVERY ACTIVITIES AND THE CLEARING OF POLLUTANTS FROM CONTAMINATED LAND. (3) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY THE MAINTENANCE REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF ANY BUILDING OR STRUCTURE WHICH IS OF HISTORIC, SCIENTIFIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST AND IS IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE. (4) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY:- (A) THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC PARK, RECREATION GROUND OR OPEN SPACE; OR (B) THE PROVISION OF SOME OTHER PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE. IN THIS CLAUSE "LANDFILL SITE" SHALL BE THE MEANING ASCRIBED BY SECTION 66 OF THE FINANCE ACT 1996.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE KING'S COLLEGE LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window