AMBASSADORS OF CHRIST (GLOBAL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Currently we have a weekly meeting for those who wish to share their faith. During the week we work with and support young people and families in Middleton. We support people in the Middleton area of Leeds through a weekly Food Bank and Well - being chat sessions. Links are kept with Romania and Colombia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,748 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Colombia
- Romania
Governance
- 06 March 2002: Standard registration
- 21 June 2019: Funds received from 1051966 SOUTH LEEDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- TOUCHING LIVES (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Scire BA PGCE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Cllr Sharon Burke | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dennis William Bernard | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Adele Louise Fraser | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
George Simpson | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.48k | £12.72k | £13.60k | £24.71k | £33.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.47k | £11.07k | £16.09k | £24.13k | £32.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £350 | £2.55k | £3.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 April 2025 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 April 2025 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 January 2022 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 January 2021 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08 SEP 2000 AS AMENDED ON 26 JAN 2002 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE. 2) THE WORLDWIDE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The ARK Family Centre
80 Throstle Lane
LEEDS
LS10 4EY
- Phone:
- 0113 5134187
- Email:
- aocglobalcharity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window