Accounts and annual returns CREDO

Charity Number: 1084241
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 29 May 2014 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 29 May 2014 118 days late
Annual return 31 March 2012 29 May 2013 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 29 May 2013 118 days late
Annual return 31 March 2011 05 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 05 October 2011 On Time