Financial history CREDO

Charity Number: 1084241
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £50.53k £55.80k £67.12k £83.15k £33.20k
Total expenditure £46.27k £52.43k £61.28k £76.62k £62.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A