(A) OPTA - (ASIAN) ORGANISATION FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF ADDICTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Substance use /misuse and mental health
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 27 August 2002: Standard registration
- (A) OPTA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IMTIAZ ILAHI BSC | Chair |
|
||||||
FARRA KHAN BSC MSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAMEEZ ALI BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALTAF SHEIKH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHAKEEL YASIN MBA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4 | £13.03k | £8.82k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.41k | £9.83k | £10.91k | £0 | £158 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 7 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 28 JULY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DRUG AND ALCOHOL ADDICTION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE SOUTH ASIAN COMMUNITY BY DEVELOPING DRUG TREATMENT AND PREVENTION PROJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
112 YARDLEY WOOD ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B13 9JE
- Phone:
- 07773352591
- Email:
- aopta@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window