NEW HAW JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
New Haw Community School PTA holds fundraising events throughout the school year, raising money to support New Haw Community School and all its students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 October 2000: Standard registration
- New Haw Community School PTA (Working name)
- NEW HAW JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT/TEACHER ASOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Payne | Chair | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Rollo | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Gooch | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Noto | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.42k | £7.48k | £5.20k | £11.28k | £13.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.63k | £11.25k | £3.23k | £5.50k | £16.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 SEPTEMBER 2000. as amended on 23 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL. TO ACHIEVE THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY :- A) DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. C) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES OR ITEMS FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDS), AS THE COMMITTEE IN CONSULTATION WITH THE GOVERNING BODY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NEW HAW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PTA at New Haw Community Junior School
The Avenue
New Haw
ADDLESTONE
Surrey
KT15 3RL
- Phone:
- 01932336571
- Email:
- ptachairnhcs@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window