Trustees THE ROAD HAULAGE ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 1082820

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES FRENCH | Chair | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Gough | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Scott McIntyre | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Damien Powell | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Blair | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Kelly | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Macrae | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Lesley O'Brien | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WILLIAM ROBERT MANSON-JENKINS | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Patrick Keith Boyle | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.