Accounts and annual returns THE ALEXANDRA CLUB (CHILTERNS) WOMEN'S CLUB

Charity number: 1083032
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 01 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 12 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 30 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 24 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 24 November 2005 On Time