WEST SUSSEX MEDIATION SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a range of mediation services, to those suffering conflicts in their lives, across West Sussex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £18,300 from 18 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 January 2001: Standard registration
- 01 August 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 01 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1202295 MEDIATION PLUS
- HORSHAM AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY MEDIATION SERVICE (Previous name)
- HORSHAM DISTRICT AND CRAWLEY MEDIATION SERVICE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.63k | £89.96k | £85.06k | £81.18k | £64.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.32k | £90.15k | £89.75k | £86.84k | £81.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.10k | £10.10k | £10.00k | £5.80k | £18.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 22 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 21 OCTOBER 2002 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2013 as amended on 27 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
I. THE SERVICE IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE SUFFERING IN WEST SUSSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS THE MEDIATION OF CONFLICT BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS, AUTHORITIES OR GROUPS INVOLVED OR LIKELY TO BE INVOLVED IN DISPUTES. II. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN WEST SUSSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE PURPOSES AND METHODS OF MEDIATION AND RECONCILIATION OR CONFLICT MANAGEMENT AND IN PARTICULAR THE MANAGING OF THEM FOR THE PURPOSES OF PEACEFUL RESOLUTION IN THE INTERESTS OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP. III. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WEST SUSSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN THE METHODS OF CONFLICT MANAGEMENT AND TO ARRANGE AND HOLD MEETINGS, CONFERENCES AND LECTURES TO DISSEMINATE GOOD PRACTICE IN PEACEFUL CONFLICT RESOLUTION FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC ORDER AND IN THE INTERESTS OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
WEST SUSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window