EALING CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ealing Crossroads provide 3 distinct services to the community;the Core Service is for day & overnight respite for adults.The Parent Carer Service provides a flexible service, offering a 2 or 3 hour weekly break (we offer choices of times and days) to meet the needs of parent/carer and child.after school group respite to families of children and young people with a range of disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 23 September 2004: Standard registration
- 03 April 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CROSSROADS CARE EALING (Working name)
- EALING CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.56k | £331.28k | £309.14k | £330.92k | £383.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £368.09k | £369.46k | £322.18k | £288.92k | £332.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 28 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 03 March 2011 | 31 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 07 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 17 December 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS, AND CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO HAVE CARE NEEDS, AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY, ILLNESS OR AGE BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISIONS OF COMMUNITY-BASED WORKERS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window