THE LATIN AMERICAN GOLDEN YEARS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Day Centre for Latin American older people living in London. The centre provides English classes, Latin American folk dance, guitar lessons, drawings and painting in canvass, computer lessons, handy craft and jewllery, exercise sessions, sewing sesions, transalation of documents and phone translations, housing and benefits advice sessions and trips to places of interests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 October 2000: Standard registration
- THE LATIN AMERICAN GOLDEN YEARS DAY CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM HILLEARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MONICA URIBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA PONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NELLY MOSQUERA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE ELDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLORIA COLLAZOS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNE GALLAGHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROUSHANARA ISLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MERCEDES ROJAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALBERTO ROJAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.78k | £72.34k | £84.99k | £84.99k | £43.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.23k | £82.12k | £88.83k | £88.83k | £42.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1202 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1567 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH JULY 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF OLD AGE OF LATIN AMERICAN ELDERLY PEOPLE LIVING IN GREATER LONDON BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES AND PERSONAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LATIN AMERICAN GOLDEN YRS CLUB
1-29 CANCELL ROAD
LONDON
SW9 6HN
- Phone:
- 02077930469
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window