Accounts and annual returns SPONSORING ALLOTMENTS IN SIBERIA

Charity Number: 1083278
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 25 July 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 March 2018 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 27 April 2017 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 27 April 2017 271 days late