CHURCH IN LONDON - REBUILT CHURCH OF THE HOLY SPIRIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Preach the full salvation of Jesus Christ-the Blood (the repentance), the Water (the water baptism) and the Holy Spirit (the Holy Spirit baptism) accordng to the Bible. 2. Build the Rebuilt Church of the Holy Spirit on the foundation of the apostles and prophets. 3. The apostles will prepare the church for works of service and administer God's grace to her until she enters God's kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 July 2001: Standard registration
- CHURCH IN LONDON - REBUILT OF THE HOLY SPIRIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yu-liang Lee | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lai Kuen TANG | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.00k | £18.07k | £20.53k | £18.63k | £19.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.92k | £59.08k | £56.94k | £18.77k | £17.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2024 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 December 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 November 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 8TH SEPTEMBER 2000 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED EXECUTED 12TH JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Waldegrave Road
Dagenham
RM8 2QD
- Phone:
- 02085993183
- Email:
- yuliang.lee@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window