TIVERTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 23 October 2000: Standard registration
- TIVERTON U3A (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Ernest Warren | Chair | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Louise Butler | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Robbins | Trustee | 27 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.52k | £4.48k | £4.27k | £4.07k | £5.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.87k | £5.32k | £6.18k | £4.77k | £5.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1998, AS AMENDED 25 JANUARY 2001, AS AMENDED 24 JANUARY 2002, AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2002, AS AMENDED 27 NOVEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED ON 23 MAR 2017 as amended on 27 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE NOT IN GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT WHO ARE IN THEIR THIRD AGE (BEING THE PERIOD OF TIME AFTER THE FIRST AGE OF CHILDHOOD DEPENDENCE AND THE SECOND AGE OF FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT AND/OR PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY) RESIDING IN TIVERTON, DEVON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Area of benefit
TIVERTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
156 Blackfriars Road
London
SE1 8EN
- Phone:
- 020 84666139
- Email:
- info@u3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window