ST MICHAELS CORNERSTONE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The St Michael's Cornerstone Trust exists to support the people of the Lynworth, Priors and Whaddon area of Cheltenham. In particular the relief of poverty, the advancement of education, the maintenance and improvement of public amenities and the provision of leisure facilities in the interests of social welfare. A Care/Share shop, lunch and homework clubs are among a range of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,500 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 30 March 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Frank Solomon | Chair | 08 October 2014 |
|
|||||
John Andrew George Kime | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Russell Johnston | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Candace Plouffe | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Thomas | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR COLIN HAY | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Holford White | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARTIN HUGH TURNER | Trustee | 15 August 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.68k | £93.15k | £79.04k | £161.28k | £167.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.90k | £78.97k | £104.44k | £113.78k | £143.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £25.63k | £23.40k | £8.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JULY 2000. as amended on 14 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND SURROUNDING PARISHES IN CHELTENHAM, AND IN PARTICULAR, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF PUBLIC AMENITIES, AND THE PROVISION OF LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND SURROUNDING PARISHES IN CHELTENHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Michaels Cornerstone Trust
The Cornerstone Centre
Severn Road
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL52 5QA
- Phone:
- 01242 777777
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window