TEMPLE BABA BALAK NATH JI EK HAI MALAK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates in the area of Sandwell, West Midlands and serves the local community in providing a place of worship and a venue for religious festivals and weddings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sandwell
Governance
- 15 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BHAGAT RANJIT SINGH JI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SURINDER KAUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARVINDER KAUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUKHJINDER SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.75k | £44.41k | £36.30k | £31.79k | £30.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.41k | £27.68k | £39.75k | £45.98k | £39.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 206 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING. I) TO RAISE FUNDS AND INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS; PROVIDED THAT IN RAISING FUNDS THE TRUSTEES SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE AND SUBSTANTIAL PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITY AND SHALL CONFORM TO ANY RELEVANT STATUTORY REGULATIONS; II) TO BUY, TAKE ON LEASE OR IN EXCHANGE, HIRE OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE ANY PROPERTY NECESSARY FOR THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE OBJECTS AND MAINTAIN AND EQUIP IT FOR USE; III) SUBJECT TO ANY CONSENTS REQUIRED BY LAW TO SELL, LEASE OR OTHERWISE DISPOSE OF ALL OR ANY PART OF THE PROPERTY COMPRISED IN THE TRUST FUND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 SOMERSET ROAD
HANDSWORTH
BIRMINGHAM
B20 2JD
- Phone:
- 01216860950
- Email:
- BARBIE.PUNIA@GOOGLEMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window