CARMARTHEN ROUND TABLE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for distribution to local charities, good caused and individuals. Fundraising activities include organising Carmarthen's Bonfire Night fireworks display, hosting a charitable golf day and various non-specific events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 15 November 2000: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 June 2011: Re-registered
- CARMARTHEN ROUND TABLE NUMBER 80 (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Bundy | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kai Baxter | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Phillips | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Griffiths | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marc Ingram | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.99k | £12.28k | £31.79k | £43.71k | £35.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.30k | £14.49k | £20.37k | £43.83k | £39.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2025 | 359 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 June 2023 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2025 | 790 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 April 2022 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES TRUSTS ASSOCIATIONS INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID
Area of benefit
CARMARTHEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Ivy Bush Royal Hotel
11 Spilman Street
CARMARTHEN
Dyfed
SA31 1LG
- Phone:
- 01267237534
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window