MRS E A HARROD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To distribute trust capital and income amongst such registered charities or such charitable purposes or such charitable objects as the trustees shall in their absolute discretion select
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Jersey
Governance
- 20 April 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL JOHN SHAW | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Simon Richard Bradley Stell | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.68k | £2.58k | £2.51k | £2.53k | £2.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.70k | £1.83k | £5.15k | £0 | £7.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 October 2024 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") NAMELY TO DISTRIBUTE THE CAPITAL AND INCOME AMONGST SUCH REGISTERED CHARITIES OR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT PROVIDING ALWAYS THE TRUSTEES IN THE EXERCISE OF THE DISCRETION GIVEN TO THEM MAY HAVE REGARD TO BUT SHALL NOT BE BOUND BY THE WISHES OF THE SETTLOR AS EXPRESSED TO THEM FROM TIME TO TIME IN WRITING AND THAT ALL DISTRIBUTIONS OF CAPITAL SHALL BE MADE ONLY WITH THE CONSENT OF THE SETTLOR IN HER LIFETIME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
L C F Barber Titleys
The Exchange
Station Parade
HARROGATE
HG1 1TS
- Phone:
- 01423502211
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window